E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3853
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 222
|
Journal Page: 3862
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 222
|
Journal Page: 5415
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5383
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2919
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1057
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Patrick
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|