Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1162 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Watson, Nichols S.B. No. 1162
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
44 April 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
55 Nays 0; April 10, 2013, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to requirements for the purchase or acquisition of a water
1111 or sewer system.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 13.301, Water Code, is amended by
1414 amending Subsections (a), (d), (e), (f), and (g) and adding
1515 Subsections (a-1), (a-2), (a-3), and (e-1) to read as follows:
1616 (a) A utility or a water supply or sewer service
1717 corporation, on or before the 120th day before the effective date of
1818 a sale, acquisition, lease, or rental of a water or sewer system
1919 that is required by law to possess a certificate of public
2020 convenience and necessity or the effective date of a merger or
2121 consolidation with such a utility or water supply or sewer service
2222 corporation, shall:
2323 (1) file a written application with the commission
2424 electronically; and
2525 (2) [unless public notice is waived by the executive
2626 director for good cause shown,] give public notice of the action.
2727 (a-1) The commission shall post the application on the
2828 commission's Internet website not later than the 30th day after the
2929 date the application is accepted for filing.
3030 (a-2) For a proposed sale, acquisition, lease, rental,
3131 merger, or consolidation transaction subject to Subsection (a) that
3232 involves more than one utility or water supply or sewer service
3333 corporation, or that involves a single utility or water supply or
3434 sewer service corporation and a political subdivision's water or
3535 sewer system, at the time notice is given under Subsection (a)(2),
3636 the parties to the proposed transaction jointly shall mail written
3737 notice to each affected customer in accordance with commission
3838 rules. The written notice must include:
3939 (1) a comparison of the rates and quality-of-service
4040 records of the parties;
4141 (2) the purchase price or lease rate of the sale,
4242 acquisition, lease, or rental;
4343 (3) the anticipated transaction costs, including
4444 legal fees, regulatory fees, and interest;
4545 (4) a disclosure of:
4646 (A) any investments or expenses any party to the
4747 transaction anticipates it will make during the next 24 months for
4848 infrastructure improvement to a water or sewer system involved in
4949 the transaction; and
5050 (B) the estimated effect the investments or
5151 expenses will have on rates;
5252 (5) the expected closing date of the transaction;
5353 (6) the estimated date by which customers to be
5454 affected by the transaction will be required to pay service fees in
5555 an amount different than service fees payable by those customers on
5656 the date of the application;
5757 (7) any plans to implement a rate change during the
5858 pendency of the proposed transaction; and
5959 (8) notice to the customer that the customer can make a
6060 written request for a public hearing to the commission.
6161 (a-3) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
6262 the executive director may waive the notice requirement if the
6363 sale, acquisition, lease, rental, merger, or consolidation
6464 transaction involves two or more parties, and all but one are in
6565 receivership, are under temporary management, or have been referred
6666 for the appointment of a temporary management or receivership.
6767 (d) After the parties to the proposed transaction have made
6868 the application as required by this section and provided notice as
6969 required by this section, the [The] commission shall, with or
7070 without a public hearing, investigate the sale, acquisition, lease,
7171 [or] rental, merger, or consolidation to determine whether the
7272 proposed transaction will serve the public interest. In making the
7373 determination, the commission shall consider:
7474 (1) the factors listed under Section 13.246(c);
7575 (2) the anticipated benefits of the transaction;
7676 (3) the anticipated costs of the transaction;
7777 (4) whether the price to be paid for the assets is
7878 excessive; and
7979 (5) if the applicant intends to consolidate water or
8080 sewer systems under a single tariff, whether the systems being
8181 consolidated have substantially similar facilities, quality of
8282 service, and cost of service.
8383 (e) On [Before] the expiration of the 120-day notification
8484 period, the executive director shall notify all known parties to
8585 the transaction of the executive director's decision whether to
8686 request that the commission hold a public hearing to determine if
8787 the transaction will serve the public interest. The executive
8888 director shall request a public hearing if, before the expiration
8989 of the 120-day notification period, at least 10 percent of the
9090 customers of a utility or a water supply or sewer service
9191 corporation subject to Subsection (a-2) make a written request for
9292 a public hearing. The executive director may request a hearing if:
9393 (1) the application filed with the commission or the
9494 public notice was improper;
9595 (2) the person purchasing or acquiring the water or
9696 sewer system has not demonstrated adequate financial, managerial,
9797 and technical capability for providing continuous and adequate
9898 service to the service area being acquired and to any areas
9999 currently certificated to the person;
100100 (3) the person or an affiliated interest of the person
101101 purchasing or acquiring the water or sewer system has a history of:
102102 (A) noncompliance with the requirements of the
103103 commission [or the Texas Department of Health]; or
104104 (B) continuing mismanagement or misuse of
105105 revenues as a utility service provider;
106106 (4) the person purchasing or acquiring the water or
107107 sewer system cannot demonstrate the financial ability to provide
108108 the necessary capital investment to ensure the provision of
109109 continuous and adequate service to the customers of the water or
110110 sewer system; or
111111 (5) there are concerns that the transaction may not
112112 serve the public interest, after the application of the
113113 considerations provided by Subsection (d) [Section 13.246(c) for
114114 determining whether to grant a certificate of convenience and
115115 necessity].
116116 (e-1) The commission shall hold a public hearing at the
117117 request of the executive director.
118118 (f) Unless the executive director requests that a public
119119 hearing be held, the sale, acquisition, lease, [or] rental, merger,
120120 or consolidation may be completed as proposed:
121121 (1) at the end of the 120-day period; or
122122 (2) at any time after the executive director notifies
123123 the utility or water supply or sewer service corporation that a
124124 hearing will not be requested.
125125 (g) If a public hearing is requested by the executive
126126 director [or if the utility or water supply or sewer service
127127 corporation fails to make the application as required or to provide
128128 public notice], the sale, acquisition, lease, [or] rental, merger,
129129 or consolidation may not be completed unless the commission
130130 determines after a public hearing that the proposed transaction
131131 serves the public interest.
132132 SECTION 2. Section 13.301, Water Code, as amended by this
133133 Act, applies only to a sale, acquisition, lease, rental, merger, or
134134 consolidation for which an application is filed with the Texas
135135 Commission on Environmental Quality on or after January 1, 2014. A
136136 sale, acquisition, lease, rental, merger, or consolidation for
137137 which an application is filed before January 1, 2014, is governed by
138138 the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act,
139139 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
140140 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act do not affect
141141 a transfer of state agency functions as provided by another Act of
142142 the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, that becomes law. To
143143 the extent functions of the Texas Commission on Environmental
144144 Quality affected by the changes in law are transferred to another
145145 agency, references to the commission in Section 13.301, Water Code,
146146 as amended by this Act, shall be construed as references to the
147147 other agency.
148148 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
149149 * * * * *