Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1176 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 1176
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 22, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1176 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of medical waste.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 361.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (18-a) to read as follows:
 (18-a)  "Medical waste" has the meaning assigned to the
 term "special waste from health care-related facilities" by
 Department of State Health Services rule and includes animal waste,
 bulk blood, bulk human blood products, bulk human body fluids,
 microbiological waste, pathological waste, and sharps. The term
 does not include:
 (A)  waste produced on a farm or ranch as defined
 by Section 151.316, Tax Code; or
 (B)  artificial, nonhuman materials removed from
 a patient and requested by the patient, including orthopedic
 devices and breast implants.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.0905 to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.0905.  REGULATION OF MEDICAL WASTE MANAGEMENT.
 (a)  The commission is responsible under this section for the
 management of medical waste.
 (b)  The commission shall accomplish the purposes of this
 chapter by requiring a permit or registration for and otherwise
 regulating the collection, treatment, storage, disposal, and
 transportation of medical waste.
 (c)  The commission has the powers and duties specifically
 prescribed by this chapter relating to medical waste management and
 all other powers necessary or convenient to carry out those
 responsibilities under this chapter.
 (d)  In matters relating to medical waste management, the
 commission shall consider water pollution control and water quality
 aspects, air pollution control and ambient air quality aspects, and
 the protection of human health and safety.
 (e)  Rules adopted to regulate municipal solid waste apply in
 the same manner to medical waste only to the extent that the rules
 address:
 (1)  the reconciliation of conflicting site operation
 plan provisions for a site that conducts activities that require a
 separate permit or authorization;
 (2)  waste acceptance and analysis;
 (3)  facility-generated waste, including wastewater
 and sludge;
 (4)  contaminated water management;
 (5)  on-site storage areas for source-separated or
 recyclable materials;
 (6)  the storage of waste:
 (A)  to prevent the waste from becoming a hazard,
 including a fire hazard, to human health or safety;
 (B)  to ensure the use of sufficient containers
 between collections; and
 (C)  to prevent the waste from becoming litter;
 (7)  approved waste containers for facilities that
 receive animal and plant health inspection service waste;
 (8)  recordkeeping and reporting requirements, except
 for rules regarding the recordkeeping provisions required to
 justify the levels of recovered recycled products;
 (9)  fire protection;
 (10)  access control;
 (11)  unloading waste;
 (12)  spill prevention and control;
 (13)  operating hours;
 (14)  facility signage;
 (15)  control of litter, including windblown material;
 (16)  facility access roads;
 (17)  noise pollution and visual screening;
 (18)  capacity overloading and mechanical breakdown;
 (19)  sanitation, including employee sanitation
 facilities;
 (20)  ventilation and air pollution control, except as
 those rules apply to:
 (A)  process areas where putrescible waste is
 processed;
 (B)  the minimal air exposure for liquid waste;
 and
 (C)  the cleaning and maintenance of mobile waste
 processing unit equipment;
 (21)  facility health and safety plans, including
 employee training in health and safety; and
 (22)  the form, submission, and accuracy of reports to
 track:
 (A)  the amount of waste stored, treated,
 processed, disposed of, recovered, or recycled; and
 (B)  the amount of processing or disposal capacity
 and reserve capacity.
 (f)  In a facility that handles medical waste, processing
 equipment shall be located not less than 25 feet from the property
 boundary unless the adjacent property owner agrees to a location
 within 25 feet. A medical waste storage unit is not subject to this
 subsection, provided that the medical waste is contained in
 transport vehicles and refrigerated below 45 degrees if the waste
 is in the facility longer than 72 hours.
 (g)  A generator of medical waste shall affix to each
 container a label that contains:
 (1)  the name and address of the generator;
 (2)  the contents of the container; and
 (3)  either:
 (A)  the date of the shipment; or
 (B)  the identification number of the shipment.
 (h)  The commission by rule shall exempt from notice and
 public comment requirements certain amendments to a permit or
 registration for a facility that handles medical waste, including
 amendments relating to operating hours and other minimum
 modifications, as determined by the commission.
 SECTION 3.  Subdivision (4), Section 7.141, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (4)  "Medical waste" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 361.003, Health and Safety [includes animal waste, bulk
 blood and blood products, microbiological waste, pathological
 waste, sharps, and special waste from health care-related
 facilities as those terms are defined in 25 T.A.C. Section 1.132
 (Texas Department of Health, Definition, Treatment, and
 Disposition of Special Waste from Health Care-Related Facilities).
 The term does not include medical waste produced on farmland and
 ranchland as defined by Section 252.001(6), Agriculture] Code.
 SECTION 4.  Section 361.560, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 5.  A facility that has a permit or registration that
 allows the handling of medical waste is not, before January 1, 2014,
 required to meet the requirements of any rule adopted to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *