1 | 1 | | By: Deuell S.B. No. 1176 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 22, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1176 By: Deuell |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the regulation of medical waste. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 361.003, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Subdivision (18-a) to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (18-a) "Medical waste" has the meaning assigned to the |
---|
17 | 17 | | term "special waste from health care-related facilities" by |
---|
18 | 18 | | Department of State Health Services rule and includes animal waste, |
---|
19 | 19 | | bulk blood, bulk human blood products, bulk human body fluids, |
---|
20 | 20 | | microbiological waste, pathological waste, and sharps. The term |
---|
21 | 21 | | does not include: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (A) waste produced on a farm or ranch as defined |
---|
23 | 23 | | by Section 151.316, Tax Code; or |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) artificial, nonhuman materials removed from |
---|
25 | 25 | | a patient and requested by the patient, including orthopedic |
---|
26 | 26 | | devices and breast implants. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 361, Health and Safety |
---|
28 | 28 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 361.0905 to read as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | Sec. 361.0905. REGULATION OF MEDICAL WASTE MANAGEMENT. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (a) The commission is responsible under this section for the |
---|
31 | 31 | | management of medical waste. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) The commission shall accomplish the purposes of this |
---|
33 | 33 | | chapter by requiring a permit or registration for and otherwise |
---|
34 | 34 | | regulating the collection, treatment, storage, disposal, and |
---|
35 | 35 | | transportation of medical waste. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) The commission has the powers and duties specifically |
---|
37 | 37 | | prescribed by this chapter relating to medical waste management and |
---|
38 | 38 | | all other powers necessary or convenient to carry out those |
---|
39 | 39 | | responsibilities under this chapter. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (d) In matters relating to medical waste management, the |
---|
41 | 41 | | commission shall consider water pollution control and water quality |
---|
42 | 42 | | aspects, air pollution control and ambient air quality aspects, and |
---|
43 | 43 | | the protection of human health and safety. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (e) Rules adopted to regulate municipal solid waste apply in |
---|
45 | 45 | | the same manner to medical waste only to the extent that the rules |
---|
46 | 46 | | address: |
---|
47 | 47 | | (1) the reconciliation of conflicting site operation |
---|
48 | 48 | | plan provisions for a site that conducts activities that require a |
---|
49 | 49 | | separate permit or authorization; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) waste acceptance and analysis; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (3) facility-generated waste, including wastewater |
---|
52 | 52 | | and sludge; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (4) contaminated water management; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (5) on-site storage areas for source-separated or |
---|
55 | 55 | | recyclable materials; |
---|
56 | 56 | | (6) the storage of waste: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (A) to prevent the waste from becoming a hazard, |
---|
58 | 58 | | including a fire hazard, to human health or safety; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (B) to ensure the use of sufficient containers |
---|
60 | 60 | | between collections; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (C) to prevent the waste from becoming litter; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (7) approved waste containers for facilities that |
---|
63 | 63 | | receive animal and plant health inspection service waste; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (8) recordkeeping and reporting requirements, except |
---|
65 | 65 | | for rules regarding the recordkeeping provisions required to |
---|
66 | 66 | | justify the levels of recovered recycled products; |
---|
67 | 67 | | (9) fire protection; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (10) access control; |
---|
69 | 69 | | (11) unloading waste; |
---|
70 | 70 | | (12) spill prevention and control; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (13) operating hours; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (14) facility signage; |
---|
73 | 73 | | (15) control of litter, including windblown material; |
---|
74 | 74 | | (16) facility access roads; |
---|
75 | 75 | | (17) noise pollution and visual screening; |
---|
76 | 76 | | (18) capacity overloading and mechanical breakdown; |
---|
77 | 77 | | (19) sanitation, including employee sanitation |
---|
78 | 78 | | facilities; |
---|
79 | 79 | | (20) ventilation and air pollution control, except as |
---|
80 | 80 | | those rules apply to: |
---|
81 | 81 | | (A) process areas where putrescible waste is |
---|
82 | 82 | | processed; |
---|
83 | 83 | | (B) the minimal air exposure for liquid waste; |
---|
84 | 84 | | and |
---|
85 | 85 | | (C) the cleaning and maintenance of mobile waste |
---|
86 | 86 | | processing unit equipment; |
---|
87 | 87 | | (21) facility health and safety plans, including |
---|
88 | 88 | | employee training in health and safety; and |
---|
89 | 89 | | (22) the form, submission, and accuracy of reports to |
---|
90 | 90 | | track: |
---|
91 | 91 | | (A) the amount of waste stored, treated, |
---|
92 | 92 | | processed, disposed of, recovered, or recycled; and |
---|
93 | 93 | | (B) the amount of processing or disposal capacity |
---|
94 | 94 | | and reserve capacity. |
---|
95 | 95 | | (f) In a facility that handles medical waste, processing |
---|
96 | 96 | | equipment shall be located not less than 25 feet from the property |
---|
97 | 97 | | boundary unless the adjacent property owner agrees to a location |
---|
98 | 98 | | within 25 feet. A medical waste storage unit is not subject to this |
---|
99 | 99 | | subsection, provided that the medical waste is contained in |
---|
100 | 100 | | transport vehicles and refrigerated below 45 degrees if the waste |
---|
101 | 101 | | is in the facility longer than 72 hours. |
---|
102 | 102 | | (g) A generator of medical waste shall affix to each |
---|
103 | 103 | | container a label that contains: |
---|
104 | 104 | | (1) the name and address of the generator; |
---|
105 | 105 | | (2) the contents of the container; and |
---|
106 | 106 | | (3) either: |
---|
107 | 107 | | (A) the date of the shipment; or |
---|
108 | 108 | | (B) the identification number of the shipment. |
---|
109 | 109 | | (h) The commission by rule shall exempt from notice and |
---|
110 | 110 | | public comment requirements certain amendments to a permit or |
---|
111 | 111 | | registration for a facility that handles medical waste, including |
---|
112 | 112 | | amendments relating to operating hours and other minimum |
---|
113 | 113 | | modifications, as determined by the commission. |
---|
114 | 114 | | SECTION 3. Subdivision (4), Section 7.141, Water Code, is |
---|
115 | 115 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
116 | 116 | | (4) "Medical waste" has the meaning assigned by |
---|
117 | 117 | | Section 361.003, Health and Safety [includes animal waste, bulk |
---|
118 | 118 | | blood and blood products, microbiological waste, pathological |
---|
119 | 119 | | waste, sharps, and special waste from health care-related |
---|
120 | 120 | | facilities as those terms are defined in 25 T.A.C. Section 1.132 |
---|
121 | 121 | | (Texas Department of Health, Definition, Treatment, and |
---|
122 | 122 | | Disposition of Special Waste from Health Care-Related Facilities). |
---|
123 | 123 | | The term does not include medical waste produced on farmland and |
---|
124 | 124 | | ranchland as defined by Section 252.001(6), Agriculture] Code. |
---|
125 | 125 | | SECTION 4. Section 361.560, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
126 | 126 | | repealed. |
---|
127 | 127 | | SECTION 5. A facility that has a permit or registration that |
---|
128 | 128 | | allows the handling of medical waste is not, before January 1, 2014, |
---|
129 | 129 | | required to meet the requirements of any rule adopted to implement |
---|
130 | 130 | | the changes in law made by this Act. |
---|
131 | 131 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
132 | 132 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
133 | 133 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
134 | 134 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
135 | 135 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
136 | 136 | | * * * * * |
---|