E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4914 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3280 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2910 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3958 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | RV#1028 | Journal Page: 3957 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3957 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3957 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3878 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3878 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 439 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 439 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |