Senate | 05/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 440 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |