E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2069 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2258 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3550 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3549 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#901 | Journal Page: 3549 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3549 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3549 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3546 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3422 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3422 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3421 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2075 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Criminal Procedure Reform, Select | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1103 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 12/11/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/11/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |