E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3600
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3600
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3600
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3600
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Menndez
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 440
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 440
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|