House
|
05/20/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 764
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 764
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 764
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 764
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 764
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 740
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 740
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 740
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 740
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 620
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Open Government
|
|
Journal Page: 114
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 114
|
Senate
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2012
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|