House | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3241 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1778 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1778 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1778 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1807 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |