Senate | 04/29/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1211 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |