E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#908
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3556
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3424
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3424
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 608
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 474
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 474
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|