E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3778 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4553 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2954 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2954 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 2954 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2954 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2165 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3762 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#963 | Journal Page: 3761 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3761 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3761 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3620 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Amended | 1-Moody and Mrquez | Journal Page: 3620 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3620 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1421 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 114 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 114 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |