Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2074 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1332 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |