House | 04/29/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1774 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1172 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1111 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA15 Davis | Journal Page: 1109 |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Motion to table fails | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |