E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2123
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2621
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#640
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2497
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2497
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/6/13 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2315
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1515
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 475
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 475
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|