Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1258 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1258
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2013; March 13, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 29, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1258 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to improving access to nursing education programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (a) and (b), Section 51.762,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board, with the assistance of an advisory committee
 composed of representatives of general academic teaching
 institutions, junior college districts, public state colleges, and
 public technical institutes, and with the consultation of all
 institutions of higher education that admit freshman-level
 students:
 (1)  shall adopt by rule:
 (A)  a common admission application form for use
 by a person seeking admission as a freshman student to a general
 academic teaching institution; [and]
 (B)  an electronic common admission application
 form for use by a person seeking admission as a freshman student to
 an institution of higher education that admits freshman-level
 students, other than a general academic teaching institution; and
 (C)  if the board determines that adoption of the
 form would be cost-effective for nursing schools, an electronic
 common admission application form for use by a person seeking
 admission as a student to an undergraduate nursing education
 program at an institution of higher education; and
 (2)  may adopt by rule a printed format common
 admission application form for use by a person seeking admission as
 a freshman student to an institution of higher education that
 admits freshman-level students, other than a general academic
 teaching institution.
 (b)  The board, with the assistance of an advisory committee
 composed of representatives of general academic teaching
 institutions, junior college districts, public state colleges, and
 public technical institutes, and with the consultation of all
 institutions of higher education that admit undergraduate transfer
 students, may adopt by rule:
 (1)  a common admission application form for use by a
 person seeking admission as an undergraduate transfer student to a
 general academic teaching institution; [and]
 (2)  an electronic or printed format common admission
 application form for use by a person seeking admission as an
 undergraduate transfer student to an institution of higher
 education that admits undergraduate transfer students, other than a
 general academic teaching institution; and
 (3)  if the board determines that adoption of the form
 would be cost-effective for nursing schools, an electronic common
 admission application form for use by a person seeking admission as
 a transfer student to an undergraduate nursing education program at
 an institution of higher education.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.026, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.026.  COMMITTEES AND ADVISORY COMMITTEES.  (a)  The
 chairman may appoint committees from the board's membership as the
 chairman [he] or the board may find necessary from time to time.
 The board may appoint advisory committees from outside its
 membership as it may deem necessary.
 (b)  If the board directs an advisory committee to assist the
 board in exercising its authority under Section 61.051(j) regarding
 an off-campus course in nursing education, including clinical
 coursework, the board shall require the advisory committee to
 include or consult with one or more for-profit career schools
 offering nursing education courses in the area where the course is
 to be offered.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter II to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER II.  NURSING FACULTY LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE PROGRAM
 Sec. 61.9821.  REPAYMENT AUTHORIZED. The board shall
 establish and administer a program to provide, in accordance with
 this subchapter and board rules, assistance in the repayment of
 student loans for nurses who:
 (1)  are serving on the faculties of nursing degree
 programs at institutions of higher education or private or
 independent institutions of higher education in positions that
 require an advanced degree in professional nursing; and
 (2)  apply and qualify for the assistance.
 Sec. 61.9822.  ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible to receive loan
 repayment assistance under this subchapter, a nurse must:
 (1)  apply to the board;
 (2)  at the time of application for repayment
 assistance have been employed full-time for at least one year as,
 and be currently employed full-time as, a faculty member of a
 nursing degree program at an institution of higher education or a
 private or independent institution of higher education; and
 (3)  comply with any additional requirements adopted by
 board rule.
 Sec. 61.9823.  LIMITATIONS. (a)  On qualifying for loan
 repayment assistance under this subchapter, a nurse may receive
 repayment assistance for each year of full-time employment as a
 faculty member of a nursing degree program at an institution of
 higher education or private or independent institution of higher
 education, not to exceed five years.
 (b)  The amount of loan repayment assistance received by a
 nurse under this subchapter may not exceed $7,000 in any one year.
 (c)  The total amount of loan repayment assistance provided
 under this subchapter may not exceed the total amount of gifts and
 grants accepted by the board for the repayment assistance and other
 funds available to the board for the repayment assistance,
 including any money reallocated under Section 61.9826.
 Sec. 61.9824.  ELIGIBLE LOANS. (a)  The board may provide
 repayment assistance for the repayment of any student loan for
 education at any public or private institution of higher education,
 including a loan for undergraduate education, received by an
 eligible person through any lender.
 (b)  The board may not provide repayment assistance for a
 student loan that is in default at the time of the nurse's
 application.
 Sec. 61.9825.  REPAYMENT. (a)  The board shall deliver any
 repayment under this subchapter in a lump sum:
 (1)  payable to both the lender or other holder of the
 loan and the nurse; or
 (2)  directly to the lender or other holder of the loan
 on the nurse's behalf.
 (b)  A repayment under this subchapter may be applied to any
 amount due in connection with the loan.
 Sec. 61.9826.  REALLOCATION OF MONEY. (a)  In each state
 fiscal year, the board shall reallocate for loan repayment
 assistance under this subchapter for a particular year any money in
 the physician education loan repayment program account established
 under Section 61.5391 that exceeds the amount necessary in that
 fiscal year for purposes of repayment assistance under Subchapter
 J.
 (b)  Any money reallocated under Subsection (a) in a fiscal
 year that is not used for loan repayment assistance under this
 subchapter in that fiscal year is treated as if that unused amount
 had not been reallocated in that fiscal year.
 Sec. 61.9827.  GIFTS AND GRANTS.  The board may solicit and
 accept gifts and grants from any source for the purposes of this
 subchapter.
 Sec. 61.9828.  RULES. (a)  The board shall adopt rules as
 necessary to administer this subchapter.
 (b)  The board shall distribute a copy of the rules adopted
 under this section and pertinent information regarding this
 subchapter to:
 (1)  each institution of higher education and private
 or independent institution of higher education;
 (2)  any appropriate state agency; and
 (3)  any appropriate professional association.
 SECTION 4.  Subsection (b), Section 61.5391, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Money in the account may not be appropriated for any
 purpose except:
 (1)  to provide loan repayment assistance to eligible
 physicians under this subchapter; or
 (2)  to provide loan repayment assistance under
 Subchapter II if reallocated under Section 61.9826.
 SECTION 5.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt the rules for loan repayment assistance under
 Subchapter II, Chapter 61, Education Code, as added by this Act, not
 later than December 1, 2013.
 SECTION 6.  Not later than September 1, 2014, the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board shall make an initial
 determination regarding whether adopting electronic common
 admission application forms for undergraduate nursing education
 programs would be cost-effective as required by Subsections (a) and
 (b), Section 51.762, Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *