House | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3368 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |