House | 05/14/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3228 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1652 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 962 |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 962 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 962 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 961 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 975 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |