E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2919
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1057
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4127
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2545
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|