E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5435 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3852 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2919 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4167 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4167 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4167 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4127 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4127 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1830 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1193 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1193 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |