House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|