E | 05/24/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3396 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1696 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2763 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1515 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 480 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 480 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |