House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1116 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |