E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3417
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#545
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1621
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1208
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 883
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|