House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 289 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 177 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 177 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 177 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 177 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 176 |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 01/09/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 28 | |
Senate | 11/28/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/28/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |