House | 05/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3371 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1576 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2545 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2549 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 West | Journal Page: 1459 |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1459 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1458 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1331 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |