E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2167
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#987
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3659
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
3-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 3658
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 883
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 498
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|