E | 05/24/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3396 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#673 | Journal Page: 2772 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2772 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2772 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3060 | Journal Page: 2714 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2274 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2274 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |