Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1363 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Huffman S.B. No. 1363
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to testimony or the production of evidence before the
 legislature or a legislative committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 301.025, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 301.025.  REQUIRING WITNESS [REFUSAL] TO TESTIFY OR
 PRODUCE EVIDENCE; IMMUNITY; COUNSEL. (a)  A witness called by the
 legislature, by either house of the legislature, or by a
 legislative committee may [does] not [have a privilege to] refuse
 to testify to a fact or produce a document or other evidence for any
 reason, except as provided by Subsection (b) [on the ground that the
 testimony or document may tend to disgrace the person or otherwise
 make the person infamous].
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (c) and (d), a witness called by
 the legislature, by either house, or by a legislative committee may
 refuse to testify to a fact or produce a document or other evidence
 on the ground that the testimony or evidence may incriminate the
 person.
 (c)  The legislature or a house of the legislature may, by
 written order adopted by the legislature or appropriate house and
 signed by the appropriate presiding officer or officers, require a
 person to testify or produce a document or other evidence
 concerning a matter under inquiry before either house or a
 legislative committee even if the person claims that the testimony
 or evidence [document] may incriminate the person [him].
 (d)  A legislative committee with authority to issue a
 subpoena or other process to compel the attendance of witnesses or
 the production of evidence may, by written order adopted by the
 committee and signed by the committee chair, require a person to
 testify or produce a document or other evidence concerning a matter
 under inquiry before the committee even if the person claims that
 the testimony or evidence may incriminate the person.
 (e) [(c)]  If a person testifies or produces a document or
 other evidence as required under Subsection (c) or (d) while
 claiming that the testimony or evidence [document] may incriminate
 the person [him], the testimony or evidence that the person was
 compelled to produce, or any information directly or indirectly
 derived from that testimony or evidence, may not be used against the
 person in any criminal prosecution, other than a prosecution for
 any offense involving perjury or making a false statement or
 providing false information [person may not be indicted or
 prosecuted for any transaction, matter, or thing about which the
 person truthfully testified or produced evidence].
 (f) [(d)]  A witness has a right to counsel when testifying
 before the legislature, either house of the legislature, or a
 legislative committee.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *