E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2167
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3761
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#962
|
Journal Page: 3760
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3760
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3760
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|