E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3433
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3433
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 3433
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/16/13 1:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 3421
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3421
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|