E
|
06/14/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3392
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#851
|
Journal Page: 3392
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3392
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3392
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 770
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|