House | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 3089 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3089 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2842 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1607 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1607 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1607 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |