Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1375 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1375
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 29, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 29, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1375 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report by the Sunset Advisory Commission of
 the self-directed semi-independent status of state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY AND REPORT. (a)  In this section,
 "commission" means the Sunset Advisory Commission.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study concerning the
 self-directed semi-independent status of state agencies.
 (c)  The study must address:
 (1)  criteria and a process to be used in determining
 whether a state agency should be given self-directed
 semi-independent status;
 (2)  criteria and a process to be used in determining
 whether the self-directed semi-independent status of a state agency
 should be revoked;
 (3)  measures to ensure adequate state oversight of
 state agencies with self-directed semi-independent status;
 (4)  reporting requirements for state agencies with
 self-directed semi-independent status;
 (5)  procedures for a state agency with self-directed
 semi-independent status to contract with and to pay for services
 received from another state agency;
 (6)  review of a state agency's self-directed
 semi-independent status as part of the agency's sunset review;
 (7)  appropriations issues related to a state agency's
 transition to self-directed semi-independent status;
 (8)  appropriations issues related to a state agency's
 transition from self-directed semi-independent status to regular
 state agency status; and
 (9)  criteria to review complaint procedures and the
 disposition of complaints by a state agency with self-directed
 semi-independent status.
 (d)  In conducting the study, the commission shall consult
 with the Legislative Budget Board.
 (e)  At the commission's request, a state agency shall
 provide information and assistance to the commission in conducting
 the study under this section.
 (f)  Not later than August 31, 2014, the commission shall
 submit a report on the commission's findings and recommendations
 to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  each member of the legislature.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *