House
|
05/21/2013
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4053
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
Journal Page: 4053
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/21/13 3:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3999
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3999
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 233
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 204
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 204
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|