Senate | 05/06/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | No action taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 12/04/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/04/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |