Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1423 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1423
22 (Hunter)
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to validating certain acts of the Lower Nueces River Water
88 Supply District transferring real property rights.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. On or before August 1, 1986, in accordance with
1111 Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985,
1212 the board of directors of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply
1313 District paid or provided for the payment of all debts and
1414 liabilities of the district and transferred all district assets to
1515 the City of Corpus Christi, including all district rights to real
1616 property. Additionally, the district's enabling legislation,
1717 Chapter 159, Acts of the 51st Legislature, Regular Session, 1949,
1818 was repealed, and the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District was
1919 dissolved in accordance with Chapter 844.
2020 SECTION 2. (a) The governmental acts and proceedings of
2121 the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District taken to comply with
2222 Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985,
2323 relating to the 1986 transfer to the City of Corpus Christi of
2424 district rights to real property included in the 1986 quitclaim
2525 deed recordings described by Section 3 of this Act are validated and
2626 confirmed as of the dates the transfers occurred. The acts and
2727 proceedings may not be held invalid because they were not performed
2828 in accordance with Chapter 51, Water Code, or other law.
2929 (b) The 1986 transfer of rights to real property included in
3030 the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section 3 of this
3131 Act by the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of
3232 Corpus Christi may not be held invalid on the ground that the
3333 transfer, in the absence of this Act, was invalid.
3434 (c) The City of Corpus Christi is the owner of the rights to
3535 real property transferred to the city in accordance with Chapter
3636 844, Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, and
3737 included in the 1986 quitclaim deed recordings described by Section
3838 3 of this Act.
3939 (d) This section does not apply to any matter that on the
4040 effective date of this Act:
4141 (1) is involved in litigation if the litigation
4242 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
4343 judgment; or
4444 (2) has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
4545 SECTION 3. The property transfers made in 1986 as quitclaim
4646 deeds in accordance with Section 3, Chapter 844, Acts of the 69th
4747 Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, transferring property from the
4848 Lower Nueces River Water Supply District to the City of Corpus
4949 Christi have been filed as follows:
5050 (1) in Nueces County on September 26, 2011, as
5151 Document 2011034981 filed in the property records of Nueces County;
5252 (2) in Atascosa County on September 30, 2011, as
5353 recording number 125295 filed in the property records of Atascosa
5454 County;
5555 (3) in Jim Wells County on September 27, 2011, as
5656 recording number 413632 filed in the property records of Jim Wells
5757 County;
5858 (4) in Live Oak County on September 27, 2011, as
5959 recording number 195798 filed in the property records of Live Oak
6060 County; and
6161 (5) in San Patricio County on September 27, 2011, as
6262 recording number 611795 filed in the property records of San
6363 Patricio County.
6464 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6565 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6666 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6767 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6868 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.