Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1428 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1428
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1; April 22, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1428 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reformation of the sentences of juveniles convicted
 of capital felonies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 44, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 44.252 to read as follows:
 Art. 44.252.  REFORMATION OF SENTENCE IN CAPITAL CASE
 INVOLVING JUVENILE DEFENDANT. The court of criminal appeals shall
 reform a sentence of imprisonment of a defendant committed to the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice for life without parole,
 including a sentence previously reformed from death to a sentence
 of imprisonment in the Texas Department of Criminal Justice for
 life without parole, to a sentence of imprisonment in the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice for life, or for any term of not more
 than 99 years, if the court finds that the defendant committed the
 offense before the defendant's 18th birthday.  The court shall make
 an individualized assessment of the defendant's circumstances and
 the circumstances surrounding the offense in determining the length
 of the reformed sentence.
 SECTION 2.  Notwithstanding Section 3, Chapter 765 (Senate
 Bill No. 839), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009,
 the changes made by that Act to Section 12.31, Penal Code, and
 Section 508.145, Government Code, apply to offenses committed
 before, on, or after September 1, 2009, the effective date of that
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *