E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4873
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#989
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3792
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/20/13 3:00PM
|
Journal Page: 3751
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Larson and Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 3750
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3750
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3614
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3614
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3614
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1560
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|