House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 2362 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2362 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2275 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 505 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 505 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |