Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1460 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1460
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to appointment of a bailiff to serve the 105th District
 Court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 53.001, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  The judge of the 105th District Court shall appoint a
 bailiff to serve the court in Kleberg County. By agreement of the
 commissioners courts of Kleberg and Kenedy Counties, the bailiff
 may serve the court in Kenedy County.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *