Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1468 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Estes S.B. No. 1468


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications of certain electric generation
 projects for programs designed to encourage the capture and
 utilization of carbon dioxide for use in enhanced oil recovery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 382.003(1-a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Advanced clean energy project" means a project
 for which an application for a permit or for an authorization to use
 a standard permit under this chapter is received by the commission
 on or after January 1, 2008, and before January 1, 2020, and that:
 (A)  involves the use of coal, biomass, petroleum
 coke, solid waste, or fuel cells using hydrogen derived from such
 fuels, in the generation of electricity, or the creation of liquid
 fuels outside of the existing fuel production infrastructure while
 co-generating electricity, whether the project is implemented in
 connection with the construction of a new facility or in connection
 with the modification of an existing facility and whether the
 project involves the entire emissions stream from the facility or
 only a portion of the emissions stream from the facility;
 (B)  with regard to the portion of the emissions
 stream from the facility that is associated with the project, is
 capable of achieving:
 (i)  on an annual basis, a 99 percent or
 greater reduction of sulfur dioxide emissions, or:
 (a)  if the project is designed for the
 use of one or more combustion turbines, an emission rate that meets
 best available control technology requirements as determined by the
 commission; or
 (b)  if the project is designed for the
 use of feedstock substantially all of which is subbituminous coal,
 an emission rate of 0.04 pounds or less of sulfur dioxide per
 million British thermal units as determined by a 30-day average;;
 (ii)  on an annual basis, a 95 percent or
 greater reduction of mercury emissions, if applicable;
 (iii)  an annual average emission rate for
 nitrogen oxides of:
 (a)  0.05 pounds or less per million
 British thermal units; or
 (b)  if the project uses gasification
 technology, 0.034 pounds or less per million British thermal units;
 and
 (iv)  an annual average emission rate for
 filterable particulate matter of 0.015 pounds or less per million
 British thermal units; and
 (C)  captures not less than 50 percent of the
 carbon dioxide in the portion of the emissions stream from the
 facility that is associated with the project and sequesters that
 captured carbon dioxide by geologic storage or other means.
 SECTION 2.  Section 120.001(2), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Clean energy project" means a project to
 construct an coal-fueled or petroleum coke-fueled electric
 generating facility, including a facility in which the fuel is
 gasified before combustion, that will:
 (A)  have a capacity of at least 200 megawatts;
 (B)  meet the emissions profile for an advanced
 clean energy project under Section 382.003(1-a)(B), Health and
 Safety Code;
 (C)  capture at least 70 percent of the carbon
 dioxide resulting from or associated with the generation of
 electricity by the facility;
 (D)  be capable of permanently sequestering in a
 geological formation the carbon dioxide captured; and
 (E)  be capable of supplying the carbon dioxide
 captured for purposes of an enhanced oil recovery project.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter H, Chapter 490, Government Code,
 section 490.352 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 490.352.  FRANCHISE TAX CREDIT FOR CLEAN ENERGY
 PROJECT. (a) The comptroller shall adopt rules for issuing to an
 entity implementing a clean energy project in this state a
 franchise tax credit. A clean energy project is eligible for a
 franchise tax credit only if the project is implemented in
 connection with the construction of a new facility.
 (b)  The comptroller shall issue a franchise tax credit to an
 entity operating a clean energy project after:
 (1)  the Railroad Commission of Texas has issued a
 certificate of compliance for the project to the entity as provided
 by Section 120.004, Natural Resources Code;
 (2)  the construction of the project has been
 completed;
 (3)  the electric generating facility associated with
 the project is fully operational;
 (4)  the Bureau of Economic Geology of The University
 of Texas at Austin verifies to the comptroller that the electric
 generating facility associated with the project is sequestering at
 least 70 percent of the carbon dioxide resulting from or associated
 with the generation of electricity by the facility; and
 (5)  the owner or operator of the project has entered
 into an interconnection agreement relating to the project with the
 Electric Reliability Council of Texas.
 (c)  The total amount of the franchise tax credit that may be
 issued to the entity designated in the certificate of compliance
 for a clean energy project is equal to the lesser of:
 (1)  10 percent of the total capital cost of the
 project, including the cost of designing, engineering, permitting,
 constructing, and commissioning the project, the cost of procuring
 land, water, and equipment for the project, and all fees, taxes, and
 commissions paid and other payments made in connection with the
 project but excluding the cost of financing the capital cost of the
 project; or
 (2)  $100 million.
 (d)  The entity designated in the certificate of compliance
 for the project may assign the franchise tax credit to any other
 entity that has or acquires an interest in the income generated by
 the project in proportion to their ownership in the project. The
 amount of the franchise tax credit for each report year is
 calculated by determining the amount of franchise tax that is due
 based on the taxable margin generated by a clean energy project from
 the generation and sale of power and the sale of any products that
 are produced by the electric generation facility. The amount of the
 franchise tax credit claimed under this section for a report year
 may not exceed the amount of franchise tax due to the state from an
 entity claiming the credit. attributable to the clean energy
 project for that report year. Any unused credit may be carried
 forward for up to 20 years.
 (e)  The comptroller may not issue a franchise tax credit
 under this section before September 1, 20183 or while a valuation
 cap agreement under Chapter 313, Tax Code is in effect for the
 project. This subsection expires September 2, 2013.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall adopt rules as necessary to implement Section 382.003, Health
 and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later than January 1,
 2014.
 SECTION 5.  The Railroad Commission of Texas may adopt rules
 as necessary to implement section 120.001(2), Natural Resources
 Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  The comptroller shall adopt rules under Section
 490.352, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.