House | 05/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2161 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 510 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |