E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/16/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2767
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3482
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 510
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 510
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|