Senate | 05/09/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |