House
|
05/21/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/21/13 5:01 PM
|
Journal Page: 3998
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3998
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/21/13 12:01 AM
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 531
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 531
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|