E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2069 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2258 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3398 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Record vote | RV#856 | Journal Page: 3397 |
House | 05/16/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3397 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3397 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3352 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3352 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1493 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1493 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 666 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 515 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 117 | |
Senate | 12/21/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/21/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |