E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3036
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#937
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3698
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3686
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Menndez
|
Journal Page: 3686
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3686
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3370
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1332
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|