E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#932
|
Journal Page: 3661
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3661
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#497
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Orr
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2304
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Orr
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3651
|
Journal Page: 2246
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|